NY A01363 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Vetoed on December 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-12 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that supervision fees for parolees shall be collected at a central location and shall not be collected by parole officers.
Title
Provides that supervision fees for parolees shall be collected at a central location and shall not be collected by parole officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-12 | Senate | tabled |
2011-12-12 | Senate | vetoed memo.82 |
2011-11-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1448 |
2011-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S296B |
2011-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.242 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.242 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-08 | Assembly | print number 1363b |
2011-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | print number 1363a |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to correction |
2011-04-28 | Assembly | reference changed to correction |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00296 (Same As) 2011-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1363B