NY A01330 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: Senate Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the crimes included in domestic violence to include identity theft, grand larceny and coercion, for purposes of assistance to victims thereof.
Title
Expands the crimes included in domestic violence to include identity theft, grand larceny and coercion, for purposes of assistance to victims thereof.
Sponsors
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] |
Asm. Charles Barron [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.89 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.73 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.73 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S06293 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES