NY S06293 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the crimes included in domestic violence to include identity theft, grand larceny and coercion, for purposes of assistance to victims thereof.
Title
Expands the crimes included in domestic violence to include identity theft, grand larceny and coercion, for purposes of assistance to victims thereof.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.881 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A01330 (Same As) 2018-01-22 - REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES