NY A01323 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - defeated in economic development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-15 - defeated in economic development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "Imette's Law"; mandates that every owner of an cabaret establishment, but which is not a restaurant, shall install security cameras at every entrance and exit of such establishment.
Title
Enacts "Imette's Law"; mandates that every owner of an cabaret establishment, but which is not a restaurant, shall install security cameras at every entrance and exit of such establishment.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] | Sen. George Latimer [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] |
Asm. William Boyland [D] | Asm. Nettie Mayersohn [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] | Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Assembly | defeated in economic development |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00972 (Same As) 2012-03-12 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES