NY A01308 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to preventing certain elected officials from being a member of an agency.
Title
Relates to preventing certain elected officials from being a member of an agency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | print number 1308a |
2021-02-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S01769 (Same As) 2022-05-04 - referred to local governments