NY A01302 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a second office of judge of the county court in the county of Chenango; provides for such judgeship to be filled at the general election to be held on November 7, 2017.
Title
Establishes a second office of judge of the county court in the county of Chenango; provides for such judgeship to be filled at the general election to be held on November 7, 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | held for consideration in judiciary |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01248 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY