NY A01297 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-8)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-03 - print number 1297a
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-03 - print number 1297a
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the prohibition of declawing of cats; makes such violation punishable by a civil penalty not to exceed $1,000.
Title
Relates to the prohibition of declawing of cats; makes such violation punishable by a civil penalty not to exceed $1,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | Assembly | print number 1297a |
2016-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to agriculture |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S04707 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S05084 (Same As) 2016-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 5084A
S05084 (Same As) 2016-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 5084A