NY A01263 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - substituted by s899
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - substituted by s899
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of environmental conservation to allow the use of glyphosate on state property: to maintain critical infrastructure; to manage roadside vegetation to ensure public safety; habitat management for the control of invasive species, noxious weeds, and pests of significant public health importance, and the protection of critical native plant species; and for research purposes to develop sustainable alternatives for agricultural and environmental usages, as well as research regarding the environmental motility of glyphosate.
Title
Authorizes the department of environmental conservation to allow the use of glyphosate on state property: to maintain critical infrastructure; to manage roadside vegetation to ensure public safety; habitat management for the control of invasive species, noxious weeds, and pests of significant public health importance, and the protection of critical native plant species; and for research purposes to develop sustainable alternatives for agricultural and environmental usages, as well as research regarding the environmental motility of glyphosate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Assembly | substituted by s899 |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.29 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00899 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - SIGNED CHAP.19