NY S00899 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - SIGNED CHAP.19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - SIGNED CHAP.19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of environmental conservation to allow the use of glyphosate on state property: to maintain critical infrastructure; to manage roadside vegetation to ensure public safety; habitat management for the control of invasive species, noxious weeds, and pests of significant public health importance, and the protection of critical native plant species; and for research purposes to develop sustainable alternatives for agricultural and environmental usages, as well as research regarding the environmental motility of glyphosate.
Title
Authorizes the department of environmental conservation to allow the use of glyphosate on state property: to maintain critical infrastructure; to manage roadside vegetation to ensure public safety; habitat management for the control of invasive species, noxious weeds, and pests of significant public health importance, and the protection of critical native plant species; and for research purposes to develop sustainable alternatives for agricultural and environmental usages, as well as research regarding the environmental motility of glyphosate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.19 |
2021-01-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.29 |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | substituted for a1263 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2021-01-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.52 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A01263 (Same As) 2021-01-25 - substituted by s899