NY A01262 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - substituted by s878
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - substituted by s878
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to working with the USDA to receive approvals and develop online fresh food purchasing options throughout the state; adds a repeal date.
Title
Relates to working with the USDA to receive approvals and develop online fresh food purchasing options throughout the state; adds a repeal date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Social Services Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Assembly | substituted by s878 |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.28 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S00878 (Same As) 2021-01-28 - SIGNED CHAP.15