NY A01232 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospitals to establish policies and procedures regarding domestic violence; establishes ongoing training programs on domestic violence for all current and new hospital employees; designates a hospital staff member to coordinate services to victims; provides for the interaction of hospitals with community domestic violence service providers in order to coordinate services to victims of domestic violence; requires hospitals to offer to contact a local advocate when admitting or treating a confirmed or suspected victim of domestic violence.
Title
Requires hospitals to establish policies and procedures regarding domestic violence; establishes ongoing training programs on domestic violence for all current and new hospital employees; designates a hospital staff member to coordinate services to victims; provides for the interaction of hospitals with community domestic violence service providers in order to coordinate services to victims of domestic violence; requires hospitals to offer to contact a local advocate when admitting or treating a confirmed or suspected victim of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1232a |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.59 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.66 |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01067 (Same As) 2016-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 1067A