NY A01177 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain owners of residential real property in the city of New York to opt out of planned city tree planting.
Title
Authorizes certain owners of residential real property in the city of New York to opt out of planned city tree planting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | print number 1177a |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to cities |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S01456 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES