NY S01456 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain owners of residential real property in the city of New York to opt out of planned city tree planting.
Title
Authorizes certain owners of residential real property in the city of New York to opt out of planned city tree planting.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1854 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1456A |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2017-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A01177 (Same As) 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken
A09760 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - referred to cities
A09760 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - referred to cities