NY A01132 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - print number 1132d
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-15 - print number 1132d
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the licensure of school psychologists; authorizes the use of the title "school psychologist" to licensed or exempt individuals; defines practice of school psychology; sets forth requirements for professional licensure (including educational attainment, experience, exam and fee); provides for issuance of limited permits under specified circumstances; identifies exempt persons.
Title
Provides for the licensure of school psychologists; authorizes the use of the title "school psychologist" to licensed or exempt individuals; defines practice of school psychology; sets forth requirements for professional licensure (including educational attainment, experience, exam and fee); provides for issuance of limited permits under specified circumstances; identifies exempt persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-15 | Assembly | print number 1132d |
2018-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | print number 1132c |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | print number 1132b |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | print number 1132a |
2017-02-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S00692 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - referred to higher education