NY A01125 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives; authorizes a licensed physician and a certified nurse practitioner to prescribe and order a non-patient specific regimen to a pharmacist licensed and located in the state for the dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives.
Title
Relates to the dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives; authorizes a licensed physician and a certified nurse practitioner to prescribe and order a non-patient specific regimen to a pharmacist licensed and located in the state for the dispensing of self-administered hormonal contraceptives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.675 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.675 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | print number 1125a |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06698 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - PRINT NUMBER 6698A