NY A01118 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines temporary total disability as the injured employee's inability to perform his or her pre-injury employment duties or any modified employment offered by the employer that is consistent with the employee's disability.
Title
Defines temporary total disability as the injured employee's inability to perform his or her pre-injury employment duties or any modified employment offered by the employer that is consistent with the employee's disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s768 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.598 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S00768 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - VETOED MEMO.188