NY S00768 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - VETOED MEMO.188
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - VETOED MEMO.188
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines temporary total disability as the injured employee's inability to perform his or her pre-injury employment duties or any modified employment offered by the employer that is consistent with the employee's disability.
Title
Defines temporary total disability as the injured employee's inability to perform his or her pre-injury employment duties or any modified employment offered by the employer that is consistent with the employee's disability.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.188 |
2022-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.598 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted for a1118 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1284 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A01118 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - substituted by s768