NY A01091 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a cause of action for fertility fraud; allows patients who have undergone assisted reproduction procedures to bring a cause of action if human reproductive material other than that which was consented to by the patient is used in such procedure; allows for compensatory and punitive damages.
Title
Establishes a cause of action for fertility fraud; allows patients who have undergone assisted reproduction procedures to bring a cause of action if human reproductive material other than that which was consented to by the patient is used in such procedure; allows for compensatory and punitive damages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-11-19 | Assembly | print number 1091a |
2021-11-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05942 (Same As) 2022-04-29 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S09073 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - REFERRED TO CODES
S09073 (Same As) 2022-05-06 - REFERRED TO CODES