NY A01080 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the appointment of a member from an agricultural advocacy organization in the state for agricultural representation on the state fire prevention and building code council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the appointment of a member from an agricultural advocacy organization in the state for agricultural representation on the state fire prevention and building code council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-07SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2023-06-07Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-07Assemblyrepassed assembly
2023-06-01Assemblyamended on third reading 1080a
2023-06-01Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2023-06-01SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-01Assemblyrecalled from senate
2023-04-26SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2023-04-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-04-26Assemblypassed assembly
2023-04-20Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.127
2023-04-17Assemblyreported
2023-01-13Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S01218 (Same As) 2023-06-01 - PRINT NUMBER 1218A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback