NY A01033 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of psychotropic medications in nursing homes and adult care facilities.
Title
Relates to the use of psychotropic medications in nursing homes and adult care facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.48 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.51 |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05441 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH