NY A01009 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the consumer protection division to establish a model notice of potential scams when selling gift cards.
Title
Requires the consumer protection division to establish a model notice of potential scams when selling gift cards.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Assembly | signed chap.47 |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-02-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-02-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.97 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1329 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.62 |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.62 |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-12 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S01329 (Same As) 2023-02-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1009