NY A00986 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-01 - substituted by s869
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-01 - substituted by s869
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the amount of members on the public health and health planning council.
Title
Relates to the amount of members on the public health and health planning council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-01 | Assembly | substituted by s869 |
2021-01-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.43 |
2021-01-20 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S00869 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - SIGNED CHAP.42