NY A00976 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-20 - amended on third reading 976a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-20 - amended on third reading 976a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
To amend the agriculture and markets law, the environmental conservation law to remove farm pond dams from required monitoring by the DEC and give the responsibility by the state soil and water conservation committee for development of guidelines and best management practices for the classification, operation and maintenance of farm pond dams.
Title
Relates to farm pond dams; defines farm pond dams as dams principally installed to enhance agricultural, environmental and conservation benefits on farms.
Sponsors
Sen. George Amedore [R] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Asm. Marcus Molinaro [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 30 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-20 | amended on third reading 976a | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.89 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-18 | ordered to third reading rules cal.483 | |
2009-06-18 | rules report cal.483 | |
2009-06-18 | reported | |
2009-06-18 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-02-24 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-07 | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S2429-A (Same As) 2010-01-29 - PRINT NUMBER 2429A