NY A00962 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - signed chap.5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - signed chap.5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits symbols of hate on state owned property.
Title
Prohibits symbols of hate on state owned property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Assembly | signed chap.5 |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-01-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.36 |
2021-01-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S883 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.5 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S00883 (Same As) 2021-01-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A962