NY A00916 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the operation of NYC transit authority subways or trains without at least one conductor on board; requires a conductor on any subway or train operated by such authority whenever the subway or train has more than two cars attached to the engine.
Title
Prohibits the operation of NYC transit authority subways or trains without at least one conductor on board; requires a conductor on any subway or train operated by such authority whenever the subway or train has more than two cars attached to the engine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Assembly | held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S03406 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions