NY S03406 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the operation of NYC transit authority subways or trains without at least one conductor on board; requires a conductor on any subway or train operated by such authority whenever the subway or train has more than two cars attached to the engine.
Title
Prohibits the operation of NYC transit authority subways or trains without at least one conductor on board; requires a conductor on any subway or train operated by such authority whenever the subway or train has more than two cars attached to the engine.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. James Sanders [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1659 |
2018-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00916 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions