NY A00901 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - signed chap.23
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - signed chap.23
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide emergency vehicles with free access to the Thruway.
Title
Relates to travel by firefighters and ambulance workers; provides emergency service permits for interchanges and barriers while emergency operation is taking place.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | signed chap.23 | |
2010-03-18 | delivered to governor | |
2010-03-10 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-03-10 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-03-08 | 3RD READING CAL.198 | |
2010-03-08 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2831A | |
2010-02-01 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2010-02-01 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-01 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-26 | amended on third reading 901a | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.85 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-02-04 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-02-04 | delivered to senate | |
2009-02-04 | passed assembly | |
2009-01-29 | advanced to third reading cal.43 | |
2009-01-26 | reported | |
2009-01-13 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-07 | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S2831-A (Same As) 2010-03-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A901A
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00901&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |