NY A00898 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - signed chap.339
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-23 - signed chap.339
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to membership of the advisory committee relating to the appearance enhancement industry.
Title
Relates to membership of the advisory committee relating to the appearance enhancement industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.339 |
2017-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1057 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5390B |
2017-05-23 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-05-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading 898b |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 898a |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-08 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.150 |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S05390 (Same As) 2017-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A898B