NY A00894 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits debt collectors from collecting or attempting to collect a debt owed by a deceased debtor that is known by such debt collector to be deceased.
Title
Prohibits debt collectors from collecting or attempting to collect a debt owed by a deceased debtor that is known by such debt collector to be deceased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.132 |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |