NY A00890 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-16 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-16 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a private right to action for unlawful price gouging for injunctive relief and recovery of actual damages or $1000 whichever is greater, or both, in addition to right of action granted to attorney general; permits the court to award a prevailing plaintiff an additional penalty of up to $5,000 for a willful or knowing violation and reasonable attorney's fees.
Title
Creates a private right to action for unlawful price gouging for injunctive relief and recovery of actual damages or $1000 whichever is greater, or both, in addition to right of action granted to attorney general; permits the court to award a prevailing plaintiff an additional penalty of up to $5,000 for a willful or knowing violation and reasonable attorney's fees.
Sponsors
Asm. Audrey Pheffer [D] | Asm. Robert Sweeney [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] |
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | recommitted to codes |
2011-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.70 |
2011-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |