NY A00811 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.504
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.504
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the use of green lights or alternating green and amber lights on municipal vehicles being used for snow removal; relates to the operation of vehicles when approaching such a parked, stopped or standing hazard vehicle.
Title
Allows for the use of green lights or alternating green and amber lights on municipal vehicles being used for snow removal; relates to the operation of vehicles when approaching such a parked, stopped or standing hazard vehicle.
Sponsors
Asm. Monica Wallace [D] | Asm. Michael Norris [R] | Asm. Karen McMahon [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Asm. Christopher Tague [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Assembly | signed chap.504 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1746 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3532A |
2022-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.51 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.71 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.71 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | print number 811a |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S03532 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A811A