NY S03532 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A811A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A811A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for the use of green lights or alternating green and amber lights on municipal vehicles being used for snow removal; relates to the operation of vehicles when approaching such a parked, stopped or standing hazard vehicle.
Title
Allows for the use of green lights or alternating green and amber lights on municipal vehicles being used for snow removal; relates to the operation of vehicles when approaching such a parked, stopped or standing hazard vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A811A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1746 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3532A |
2021-05-10 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00811 (Same As) 2022-08-17 - signed chap.504