NY A00776 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-1)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - signed chap.4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies; requires limited liability companies that make expenditures for a political purpose to file with the state board of elections, the identity of all direct and indirect owners of the membership interests in the limited liability company and the proportion of each direct or indirect member's ownership interest in the limited liability company.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies; requires limited liability companies that make expenditures for a political purpose to file with the state board of elections, the identity of all direct and indirect owners of the membership interests in the limited liability company and the proportion of each direct or indirect member's ownership interest in the limited liability company.

Sponsors

Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. Carl Heastie [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]
Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]
Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]
Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]
Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Simcha Eichenstein [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]
Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]
Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]
Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]Asm. David Gantt [D]
Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]
Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]

Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24Senatesigned chap.4
2019-01-14Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-01-14SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-01-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-01-14Senate3RD READING CAL.7
2019-01-14SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1101
2019-01-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-01-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-01-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.5
2019-01-14Assemblyrules report cal.5
2019-01-14Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-10Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S01101 (Same As) 2019-01-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A776

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00776&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00776&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00776
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00776&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00776&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00776&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A776#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00776&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A776#SF2

Bill Comments

feedback