NY S01101 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A776
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies; requires limited liability companies that make expenditures for a political purpose to file with the state board of elections, the identity of all direct and indirect owners of the membership interests in the limited liability company and the proportion of each direct or indirect member's ownership interest in the limited liability company.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies; requires limited liability companies that make expenditures for a political purpose to file with the state board of elections, the identity of all direct and indirect owners of the membership interests in the limited liability company and the proportion of each direct or indirect member's ownership interest in the limited liability company.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-14SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A776
2019-01-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.7
2019-01-14SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-01-10SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00776 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - signed chap.4

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback