NY A00746 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - delivered to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - delivered to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the possession of opioid antagonists and receipt into evidence.
Title
Relates to the possession of opioid antagonists and receipt into evidence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.39 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.15 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04581 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CODES