NY A00697 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - print number 697b
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - print number 697b
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines a public group self-insurer for the payment of compensation to employees of county self-insurance plans, boards of cooperative educational services and consortia by boards of cooperative educational services; makes related provisions.
Title
Defines a public group self-insurer for the payment of compensation to employees of county self-insurance plans, boards of cooperative educational services and consortia by boards of cooperative educational services; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Assembly | print number 697b |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | print number 697a |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S05873 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES