NY A00658 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Seeks to comply with the federal equal pay act of 1963 by implementing a state policy of compensating employees in state service equally for work of comparable value by eliminating wage inequality in job titles having been segregated by sex, race or national origin; requires the president of the civil service commission to report annually to the legislature and the governor on those segregated titles for which wage disparity exists; mandates governor to appropriate monies to ensure wage disparities are corrected.
Title
Seeks to comply with the federal equal pay act of 1963 by implementing a state policy of compensating employees in state service equally for work of comparable value by eliminating wage inequality in job titles having been segregated by sex, race or national origin; requires the president of the civil service commission to report annually to the legislature and the governor on those segregated titles for which wage disparity exists; mandates governor to appropriate monies to ensure wage disparities are corrected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.54 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.34 |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | rules report cal.34 |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05480 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS