NY A00645 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes peer recovery advocate telehealth services and credentialed family peer advocates for reimbursement.
Title
Authorizes peer recovery advocate telehealth services and credentialed family peer advocates for reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | print number 645a |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02998 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HEALTH