NY A00586 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.39
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases age for use of ATVs by minors from age ten to fourteen.
Title
Increases age for use of ATVs by minors from age ten to fourteen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.39 |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.138 |
2021-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00680 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION