NY A00567 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - signed chap.106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - signed chap.106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requirements of a witness to a designating petition or independent nominating petition.
Title
Relates to requirements of a witness to a designating petition or independent nominating petition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Senate | signed chap.106 |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-04-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-04-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.310 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S218 |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.25 |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S00218 (Same As) 2017-04-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A567