NY A00473 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the secretary of state to compile, make public and keep current certain information about state boards.
Title
Requires the secretary of state to compile, make public and keep current certain information about state boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.160 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.471 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | substituted for a473 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.483 |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s2975 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.471 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02975 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.160