NY A00431 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Bans the sale of employment data reports without written consumer consent; provides such employment data reports shall include, but not be limited to, payroll and earnings information, hours worked, consumer history and health insurance information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bans the sale of employment data reports without written consumer consent; provides such employment data reports shall include, but not be limited to, payroll and earnings information, hours worked, consumer history and health insurance information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2019-03-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.47
2019-02-11Assemblyreported
2019-02-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S03970 (Same As) 2019-02-22 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback