NY A00431 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-14 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of health to take action when high risk areas of lead poisoning are designated; requires the commissioner of health to provide written notice instructing such condition be discontinued within a specified period of time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of health to take action when high risk areas of lead poisoning are designated; requires the commissioner of health to provide written notice instructing such condition be discontinued within a specified period of time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-14SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2014-01-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-01-14Assemblypassed assembly
2014-01-08Assemblyordered to third reading cal.31
2014-01-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-01-08SenateDIED IN SENATE
2013-03-07SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2013-03-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2013-03-07Assemblypassed assembly
2013-03-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.26
2013-03-05Assemblyrules report cal.26
2013-03-05Assemblyreported
2013-03-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2013-01-15Assemblyreported referred to codes
2013-01-09Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S07287 (Same As) 2014-05-09 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback