NY A00401 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to an electronically submitted absentee ballot application.
Title
Relates to an electronically submitted absentee ballot application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.973 |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | print number 401a |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-09 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01516 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS