NY A00393 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing an interagency task force on hate crimes and domestic terrorism; requires an annual report to the governor and leaders of the legislature including data gathered by the task force on the nature, extent, and incidence of hate crimes and domestic terrorism in the state and a summary of any recommendations developed over the year to strengthen state and local prevention efforts and any other information deemed necessary; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Relates to establishing an interagency task force on hate crimes and domestic terrorism; requires an annual report to the governor and leaders of the legislature including data gathered by the task force on the nature, extent, and incidence of hate crimes and domestic terrorism in the state and a summary of any recommendations developed over the year to strengthen state and local prevention efforts and any other information deemed necessary; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] |
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Monica Wallace [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | print number 393a |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |