NY A00367 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - substituted by s972
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - substituted by s972
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the early childhood advisory council.
Title
Relates to the early childhood advisory council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Assembly | substituted by s972 |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.44 |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S00972 (Same As) 2017-03-15 - SIGNED CHAP.14