NY S00972 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - SIGNED CHAP.14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - SIGNED CHAP.14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the early childhood advisory council.
Title
Relates to the early childhood advisory council.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.14 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.44 |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | substituted for a367 |
2017-01-18 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-01-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-01-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-01-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.5 |
2017-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A00367 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - substituted by s972