NY A00363 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - substituted by s985
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - substituted by s985
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of bonds to finance airport improvements at the East Hampton Airport.
Title
Relates to the issuance of bonds to finance airport improvements at the East Hampton Airport.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Assembly | substituted by s985 |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.26 |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S00985 (Same As) 2017-03-15 - SIGNED CHAP.22