NY A00356 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to school zone speed limits; requires signage and other traffic calming devices in such speed zones.
Title
Relates to school zone speed limits; requires signage and other traffic calming devices in such speed zones.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | print number 356a |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01634 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - LOST