NY A00356 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this legislation is to create the Technology Employment Community Hub Center (TECH) Program.
Title
An act to amend the public authorities law, in relation to creating the technology employment community hub (TECH) centers program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-16 | tabled | |
2010-08-13 | vetoed memo.6738 | |
2010-08-03 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-16 | 3RD READING CAL.972 | |
2010-06-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2293B | |
2010-01-26 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2010-01-26 | delivered to senate | |
2010-01-26 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.22 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-05-04 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | |
2009-05-04 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-04 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-30 | advanced to third reading cal.414 | |
2009-04-28 | reported | |
2009-04-21 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-07 | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S02293 (Same As) 2010-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A356